House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 144-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-03-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to PDP, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|