12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/08/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-03-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Pending introduction. |