Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3329) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 344).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 996-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-11-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|