Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 349).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|