House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-04-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|