House | 02/18/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 569-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-22 at 9:30AM. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to GVR, CPC, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |