LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2505
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB2505
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB2505
Action History
House
02/16/2022
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/11/2022
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-16-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
House
02/11/2022
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-16-22 at 9:30 AM.
House
02/09/2022
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
House
01/28/2022
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 3
House
01/26/2022
Introduced and Pass First Reading.