House
|
06/23/2022
|
Act 114, on 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Act 114, 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, Quinlan voting no (3) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Wakai. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 232-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 232-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Nishimoto, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-29-22 3:01PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 739).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ilagan, Okimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 861) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3885) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3447) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 353).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Sayama, Tarnas, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Kong, Matsumoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Takumi, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, Tam, Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-03-22 2:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Tam, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Har, Kapela, Okimoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Takumi voting no (7) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Okimoto; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|