|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ganaden, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Kapela, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 8:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|