Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB28 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 28 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to the minimum wage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 28
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 28
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 relating to the minimum wage.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 PART I SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows: "(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; [and] (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016[,]; (4) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2022; and (5) 25 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2023, through December 31, 2023, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage." PART II SECTION 2. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. [(a)] Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018. [(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage.]" SECTION 3. Section 387-1, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by deleting the definition of "tipped employee". "["Tipped employee" means any employee engaged in an occupation in which the employee customarily and regularly receives more than $20 a month in tips.]" PART III SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2021; provided that part II shall take effect on January 1, 2024. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 PART I
5050
5151 SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows:
5252
5353 "(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than:
5454
5555 (1) 25 cents;
5656
5757 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; [and]
5858
5959 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016[,];
6060
6161 (4) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2022; and
6262
6363 (5) 25 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2023, through December 31, 2023,
6464
6565 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage."
6666
6767 PART II
6868
6969 SECTION 2. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows:
7070
7171 "§387-2 Minimum wages. [(a)] Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than:
7272
7373 (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003;
7474
7575 (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006;
7676
7777 (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007;
7878
7979 (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015;
8080
8181 (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016;
8282
8383 (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and
8484
8585 (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018.
8686
8787 [(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than:
8888
8989 (1) 25 cents;
9090
9191 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and
9292
9393 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016,
9494
9595 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage.]"
9696
9797 SECTION 3. Section 387-1, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by deleting the definition of "tipped employee".
9898
9999 "["Tipped employee" means any employee engaged in an occupation in which the employee customarily and regularly receives more than $20 a month in tips.]"
100100
101101 PART III
102102
103103 SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
104104
105105 SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2021; provided that part II shall take effect on January 1, 2024.
106106
107107
108108
109109 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
110110
111111 INTRODUCED BY:
112112
113113 _____________________________
114114
115115 Report Title: Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Adjustment; Repeal Description: Adjusts the tip credit beginning on January 1, 2022. Repeals the tip credit on January 1, 2024. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
116116
117117
118118
119119
120120
121121 Report Title:
122122
123123 Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Adjustment; Repeal
124124
125125
126126
127127 Description:
128128
129129 Adjusts the tip credit beginning on January 1, 2022. Repeals the tip credit on January 1, 2024.
130130
131131
132132
133133
134134
135135
136136
137137 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.