|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|