|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to EET/HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 114).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21 at 10:30 AM in room 423.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EEP, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|