12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21. | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |