12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/05/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1). | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to WAL, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |