|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Ihara.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 674) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
The committee on JDC has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HMS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 898) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|