12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/11/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 8:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to PDP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |