|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS/EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 46).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 66) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|