|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 10:00AM; CR 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:15AM in conference room CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Takumi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; English Co-Chair; Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 442).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
One Day Notice 04-08-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to TRS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|