|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 47).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Branco, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Hashimoto, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, McDermott, McKelvey, Okimoto, Quinlan, Todd, Tokioka, Ward voting no (15) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Branco, Holt, Ilagan; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|