|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 7).
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|