|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Re-Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Re-Referred to HTH, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 314).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Deferred one day 03-11-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|