|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-23-21 3:01PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVO/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Re-Referred to GVO/CPN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to GVO, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 13).
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 488), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 102) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to GVR, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|