|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 4:05PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-21 4:00PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Nakamura, Perruso Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Moriwaki added as Co-Chair. Senator Kanuha discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Chang, Kanuha Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 442).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 617) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
One Day Notice 04-08-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from EDU/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to EDU/HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 61).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EDN, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|