|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 226).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Kapela, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Perruso, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 890) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|