|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 490) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 93) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to PDP, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|