|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
The committee on JDC has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:30PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HTH/PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 405), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Re-referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|