|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 10:00AM in conference room CR 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-22-21 at 5:10PM in Conference Room CR 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 9:50AM in conference room CR 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 5:00PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Moriwaki, Kidani Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Kitagawa, Marten Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 689) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
One Day Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 3:05PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Re-Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 63).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|