|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to WTL, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 230).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|