12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/12/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to EEP, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |