|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Misalucha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Johanson, Marten Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 692) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-09-21 10:10AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:15PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to EET/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 231).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 920) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|