12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/08/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |