|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Recommitted to CPC with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Deferred one day 03-11-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-12-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|