Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021
Bill February 16, 2021