|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from EDN/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, DeCoite, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/HET on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|