12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/17/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |