|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|