12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/17/2021 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2021 | Pending introduction. |