|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 244).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|