12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/10/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-05-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Pending introduction. |