|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 12; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 13 (Senator(s) Acasio, Dela Cruz, English, Fevella, Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
One Day Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
The committee on JDC has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported from AEN/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to AEN/HWN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 248).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|