|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|