Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 104).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Marten voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Tam, Todd; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|