|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from EDU/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1127) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:10PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 139).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|