|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 252).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Perruso, Tam, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|