|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:15AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|