|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|