|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 843).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Chang, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Misalucha, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 722) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole, Kim, San Buenaventura. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 143).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Ilagan, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Re-referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Ilagan, Kapela, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ilagan; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 8:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|