|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:15PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 79).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 692), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 263) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HSG, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|