12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/09/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Pending introduction. |