12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/17/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Quinlan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Pending introduction. |